State Aid

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Frederick County Public Charter School Program - EstablishmentDelegate SchulzIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0065
    (SB0224)
Education - Maintenance of Effort - Lease Payment ExclusionDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0094
    (SB0051 / CH0145)
Commission on African American History and Culture - DutiesDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0187 / CH0228
    (SB0021)
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of FundsDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0215
    (SB0183 / CH0477)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0444Homeless Expenditures Accountability ActDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0502State Department of Education - Financial Advisory Board - EstablishmentDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0550State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0648Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Partial State ReimbursementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0673Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Full State ReimbursementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0696Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2015Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0759 / CH0274Health Insurance - Small Employer Health Benefit Plan Premium Subsidy Program - RepealDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0837Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0948
    (SB0473)
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding AllocationDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0965 / CH0291
    (SB0334)
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015Delegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1079
    (SB0627)
Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - AlterationsDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1193
    (SB0228)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0021
    (HB0187 / CH0228)
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of FundsSenator HersheyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0051 / CH0145
    (HB0094)
Commission on African American History and Culture - DutiesSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 145Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0131Baltimore City Community College - Tuition Waivers - Graduates of Baltimore City Public High SchoolsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0134
    (HB1091)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0181Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0183 / CH0477
    (HB0215)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0224
    (HB0065)
Education - Maintenance of Effort - Lease Payment ExclusionSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0228
    (HB1193)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0334
    (HB0965 / CH0291)
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015Senator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0473
    (HB0948)
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding AllocationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0627
    (HB1079)
Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - Alteration and StudySenator EckardtIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0629Washington County - Maintenance of Effort - Lease Payment ExclusionSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0683State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - EstablishedSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0885Education Funding and Formulas - Amendment - Supermajority VoteSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0939Prince George's County - Maintenance of Effort - Property Tax RateSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.