State Aid

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0552Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0598Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0696
    (SB0849)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0931Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0984
    (SB0475)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
HB1503Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - ReportsDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0273 / CH0692State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity ProgramSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 692Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0346Education - Prekindergarten Students - FundingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0475
    (HB0984)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0712Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0849
    (HB0696)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.