State Aid

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0557Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of FundDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0941 / CH0396Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – EligibilityDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1113Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi SyndromeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1203
    (SB1141)
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1240Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1341
    (SB0933 / CH0419)
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – RevisionsDelegate JonesIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1361Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1432Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot ProgramDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1476Education - Supplemental Prekindergarten Grant - EligibilityDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1549Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Safety (E4)
HB1565
    (SB1060)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1606Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Vocational Certificate Grant Program - EstablishedDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1607 / CH0565Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and OperationDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1753
    (SB0776)
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship ProgramDelegate GlennIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB0026State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - MergerChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0737State Finance and Procurement - State-Funded Entities - Diversity in AdvertisingSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0776
    (HB1753)
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship ProgramSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0933 / CH0419
    (HB1341)
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – RevisionsSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB1003Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - LimitationsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1060
    (HB1565)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB1141
    (HB1203)
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018Senator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1210Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)Senator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:31 P.M.