State Documents

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0162
    (SB0611)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0678
    (SB0478)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0702
    (SB0657)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0752
    (SB0738)
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering DocumentsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0989
    (SB0713)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0478
    (HB0678)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0611
    (HB0162)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0713
    (HB0989)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0738
    (HB0752)
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering DocumentsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.