State Police, Department of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0036Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0060Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013Delegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0246 / CH0091
    (SB0389)
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - ProceduresDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Environmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0289
    (SB0699 / CH0192)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0460 / CH0231Gaming - Background InvestigationsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0521Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Handgun Qualification License HoldersDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0539
    (SB0539)
Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0612
    (SB0575 / CH0304)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationDelegate GriffithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0623Public Safety - Criminal Justice Information System - Integration With Maryland Automated Firearms SystemDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0715
    (SB0584)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0716Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Qualified Handgun Instructors and Permit HoldersDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0800Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Training Requirement for Renewal ApplicationsDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0818Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) CheckDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0934Firearms - Application for Purchase and Required Registration - Use of Term "Voluntary" Registrant ProhibitedDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1005Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Retired MilitaryDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1200 / CH0202
    (SB0752)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB1341Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1349 / CH0249
    (SB0868)
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014Delegate BraveboyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1472Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - StudyDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0142Inspection of Public Records - Internal Investigations Division of the Baltimore Police DepartmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations Operating Budget (B1)
SB0283Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0389
    (HB0246 / CH0091)
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - ProceduresSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0399 / CH0057Security Systems Services - Complaint InvestigationsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0539
    (HB0539)
Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement OfficersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0575 / CH0304
    (HB0612)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0584
    (HB0715)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0699 / CH0192
    (HB0289)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0729Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0731Department of State Police - Firearms - Prohibition on Provision of InformationSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0752
    (HB1200 / CH0202)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
SB0758Assault Weapons - Firearms Collector - PossessionSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0838Private Process Servers - LicensingSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0860 / CH0201Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0868
    (HB1349 / CH0249)
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014Senator BensonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations Public Safety (E4)
SB0935Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State PoliceSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0939 / CH0362State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Leave of Absence - Extension of Purchase PeriodSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.