State Police, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0013Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) CheckDelegate SchulzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0021Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Qualified Handgun Instructors and Permit HoldersDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0039
    (SB0736 / CH0379)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Third Reading Passed (135-2)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0189 / CH0404
    (SB0261)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0382 / CH0244Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know ActDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0432Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0477
    (SB0326)
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - TermDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0767
    (SB0100)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0954 / CH0134Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1057Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - ProhibitionDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1110 / CH0298Law Enforcement - Special Police OfficersChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 298Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0086 / CH0323Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0100
    (HB0767)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0261
    (HB0189 / CH0404)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0326
    (HB0477)
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - TermSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0370 / CH0164Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0407Public Safety - Handgun PermitsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0618 / CH0184Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification CardSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0692Public Safety - State Police - Statewide Database on Police BrutalitySenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0736 / CH0379
    (HB0039)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0781Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training WaiverSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.