State Police, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0015Harford County - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0017Firearms - Digital Fingerprint Record - Permit RenewalDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0076 / CH0610Department of State Police - Investigation AuthorityChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0346
    (SB1037)
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - ProhibitionDelegate CarterIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0375
    (SB0184)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0454 / CH0037
    (SB0378 / CH0023)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalarySpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0725Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School PropertyDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0763State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Domestic Relations OrdersDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0769
    (SB0214)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training WaiverDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0805
    (SB0774 / CH0231)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsDelegate BeidleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0846Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and AnalysisDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0904Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1000
    (SB1040)
Public Safety - Firearms - Terrorist WatchlistDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1260Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1326Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Application ReportDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1340
    (SB0944)
Firearms - Applications - Notification and ReportingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1443Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Vehicle and Officer Identification Requirements (Police Identification and Accountability Act of 2016)Delegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1522Public Safety - Handgun Permits - ExpirationDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0013Public Safety - Department of State Police - Transfer of Surplus Military PropertySenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0184
    (HB0375)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0206
    (HB0140 / CH0477)
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program EvaluationPresidentIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0213State Police - Speed Camera Revenue - Enforcement ActivitiesSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0214
    (HB0769)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training WaiverSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0238Public Safety - Law Enforcement Dogs - Protective EquipmentSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0276Public Safety - Handgun Permits - ExpirationSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0378 / CH0023
    (HB0454 / CH0037)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalaryPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0774 / CH0231
    (HB0805)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0875State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Benefits StudySenator SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0944
    (HB1340)
Firearms - Applications - Notification and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1037
    (HB0346)
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - ProhibitionSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1040
    (HB1000)
Public Safety - Firearms - Terrorist WatchlistSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.