State Police, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0006Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Application ReportDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0121 / CH0375Environment - Hazardous Material Security - RepealChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0610Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0611Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School PropertyDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0661Public Health - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0776
    (SB0757)
State Personnel - Department of State Police - Forensic Scientist SalariesDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0815 / CH0272
    (SB0401 / CH0271)
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership ElectionsDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0827Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training WaiverDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0875Firearms - Handgun Qualification License - Firearms Safety TrainingDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0877 / CH0191
    (SB0023 / CH0190)
Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police OfficersDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0908Police Officer Certification Work Group - Eligibility of Individuals with Permanent Residency StatusDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0917
    (SB0878)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1036Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary ApprovalDelegate ReyIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1065Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance TechnologiesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1141
    (SB1094)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1271
    (SB0952)
Business Regulation - Security Systems - Permitting and RegistrationDelegate BranchIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1359Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication and Text-Messaging Devices While Driving - Enforcement - StudyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1380
    (SB0978)
Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Appointment and TermDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1404Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices StudyDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0023 / CH0190
    (HB0877 / CH0191)
Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police OfficersSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 190Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0401 / CH0271
    (HB0815 / CH0272)
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership ElectionsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0757
    (HB0776)
State Personnel - Department of State Police - Forensic Scientist SalariesSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0878
    (HB0917)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologySenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0952
    (HB1271)
Business Regulation - Security Systems - Permitting and RegistrationSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0978
    (HB1380)
Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Appointment and TermSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1094
    (HB1141)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1180Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 10, 2017 9:02 A.M.