State Police, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0029
    (SB0027)
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary ApprovalDelegate ReyIn the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0314
    (SB0431)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0398Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsDelegate SaabIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0578Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance TechnologiesDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0756Public Safety - Handguns - Trace Information DatabaseDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0757Public Safety - Handguns Used in Crime - Trace RequestDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0760Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School PropertyDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0819 / CH0253
    (SB0741)
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – AppealsDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0904Gun–Free Higher Education ZonesDelegate Barnes, B.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1011Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - Thin Blue LineDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1124 / CH0429Criminal Procedure – Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System – RecommendationsDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1145Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Issuance and AppealDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1189
    (SB0497)
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace OrderDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1209 / CH0502Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law)Delegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1214Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - EstablishmentDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1431Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1534
    (SB1153)
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission ExceptionDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1538Public Safety - Handgun Permits - ScopeDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1801
    (SB1226)
Primary and Secondary Schools - Armed School Resource OfficersDelegate SzeligaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1803
    (SB1241)
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police ForceDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1822Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police DepartmentDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0027
    (HB0029)
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary ApprovalSenator HoughIn the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0196Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Issuance With Permit to Carry, Wear, or TransportSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0431
    (HB0314)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologySenator KelleyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0442Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body AttachmentsSenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0497
    (HB1189)
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace OrderSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0499Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert ProgramSenator SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0741
    (HB0819 / CH0253)
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – AppealsSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0907Public Safety - Firearms DatabaseSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1118Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - EstablishmentSenator HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)
SB1153
    (HB1534)
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission ExceptionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1226
    (HB1801)
Primary and Secondary Schools - Armed School Resource OfficersSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
SB1241
    (HB1803)
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police ForceSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB1262Public Safety - Background Information for Firearm License Investigations - School Crisis Welfare Officers (School Safety Act 2018: Prevention)Senator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1264Primary and Secondary Schools - Law Enforcement Presence (School Safety Act 2018: Deterrence)Senator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.