State's Attorneys

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0282
    (SB0229)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0336
    (SB0009)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0484Maryland Open Meetings Act - Enforcement AuthorityDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0489 / CH0373
    (SB0504)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1018
    (SB0793)
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion ProgramsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1022
    (SB0655)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1024Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - MembershipDelegate McDermottVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1112
    (SB0556)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1220 / CH0409Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear DesignationDelegate SwainApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1312
    (SB0456)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1454Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1481
    (SB0557 / CH0287)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
HB1518Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's OfficeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0009
    (HB0336)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0229
    (HB0282)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0456
    (HB1312)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0504
    (HB0489 / CH0373)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0556
    (HB1112)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0557 / CH0287
    (HB1481)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0655
    (HB1022)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0674 / CH0522Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - MembershipSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0793
    (HB1018)
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion ProgramsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0985Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance SuitsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.