State's Attorneys

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0048Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Nolle ProsequiDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0166 / CH0170
    (SB0207 / CH0169)
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's AttorneyDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Judiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0374Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without HearingDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0439 / CH0734
    (SB0246)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 734Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0457 / CH0134
    (SB0347 / CH0135)
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0502
    (SB0480)
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate JudgmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0573
    (SB0456 / CH0437)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0593 / CH0800
    (SB0348 / CH0799)
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of ErrorDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0764 / CH0541
    (SB0676 / CH0540)
Requirements for Filial Support - RepealDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1141
    (SB1094)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1157
    (SB0879)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1179
    (SB1136)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryDelegate SophocleusIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1182 / CH0495
    (SB0827)
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1208
    (SB0616)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1215
    (SB0983)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1403
    (SB0409)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsBaltimore City DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1602Public Health - Vital Records - FeesDelegate KipkeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0207 / CH0169
    (HB0166 / CH0170)
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's AttorneySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0246
    (HB0439 / CH0734)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0347 / CH0135
    (HB0457 / CH0134)
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0348 / CH0799
    (HB0593 / CH0800)
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of ErrorSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0409
    (HB1403)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsBaltimore City SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0456 / CH0437
    (HB0573)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0480
    (HB0502)
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate JudgmentSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0616
    (HB1208)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0676 / CH0540
    (HB0764 / CH0541)
Requirements for Filial Support - RepealSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0727
    (HB1424)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - NotificationSenator SmithIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0827
    (HB1182 / CH0495)
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator HoughIn the House - Second Reading PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0879
    (HB1157)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0946Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0983
    (HB1215)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1094
    (HB1141)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1136
    (HB1179)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.