State's Attorneys

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0174
    (SB0375)
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - ExpansionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0461Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0618Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0770Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as PredecessorDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1029 / CH0146Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent OffenderDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1057Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without HearingDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1082
    (SB0593)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1169
    (SB0343)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1267
    (SB0869)
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1330Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political ConsultingDelegate McMillanIn the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1494
    (SB0964)
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot ProgramDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1646 / CH0251
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1811Education - Threat Assessment Teams - Establishment and OversightDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0343
    (HB1169)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0375
    (HB0174)
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - ExpansionSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0581Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0748
    (HB0791)
Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0869
    (HB1267)
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human TraffickingSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0964
    (HB1494)
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and ReportsSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1036
    (HB1646 / CH0251)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB1268Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for DischargeSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 2:04 P.M.