Statutes of Limitation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0064 / CH0220Alcoholic Beverages - Local Licensing Boards - Judicial ReviewDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Economic Matters
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0102
    (SB0093)
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0113 / CH0131Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirements and Limits on LiabilityDelegate ConawayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0115 / CH0221
    (SB0721)
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0186
    (SB0101)
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0509 / CH0254Environment - Statute of Limitations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0553
    (SB0585)
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0725
    (SB0668)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of LimitationsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0829
    (SB0570)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB1046Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1072
    (SB0784)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1214Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of DamagesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0016Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor and Felony ConvictionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0093
    (HB0102)
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0101
    (HB0186)
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0137Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of LimitationsSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0147Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice RequirementsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0374 / CH0165
    (HB0405)
Maryland False Claims ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0425Labor and Employment - Wage Disclosure and Discussion ProtectionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0570
    (HB0829)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0585
    (HB0553)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0668
    (HB0725)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of LimitationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0721
    (HB0115 / CH0221)
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0784
    (HB1072)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0823Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance EntitySenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.