St. Mary's County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007 / CH0346Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - ModificationsDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0216 / CH0358
    (SB0035)
Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 358Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0257 / CH0094St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership RequirementsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0285St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicenseSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0288 / CH0096St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0301 / CH0364St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery LicenseSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0423St. Mary's County - Building Impact FeesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0520St. Mary's County - Public Officials - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0555 / CH0378St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - DeferralsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0831 / CH0564
    (SB0828 / CH0563)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0992Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility RenovationDelegate BohananIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1019 / CH0293
    (SB0586 / CH0292)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1507 / CH0690St. Mary's County - Property MaintenanceSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0035
    (HB0216 / CH0358)
Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesSenator PipkinIn the House - Favorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0586 / CH0292
    (HB1019 / CH0293)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0828 / CH0563
    (HB0831 / CH0564)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0841 / CH0428
    (HB0863)
Higher Education Fair Share ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0920 / CH0333Natural Resources - Submerged Land and Water Column Leases - Herring CreekSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.