Storage

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0131
    (SB0531)
Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0279
    (SB0725)
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap MetalDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/7/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0332
    (SB0185)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0383Gun Shops - Security Requirements for Regulated FirearmsDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0451
    (SB0310)
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - StorageDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0457
    (SB0562)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0655
    (SB0532)
Criminal Law - Child's Access to Firearms - PenaltyDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0861Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage RequirementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0905
    (SB0335 / CH0231)
Health Occupations - Funeral Establishments - Preparation and Holding RoomsDelegate KachVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0997
    (SB0867)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1014 / CH0560
    (SB0815 / CH0559)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Epinephrine Availability and Use - PolicyDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1040 / CH0399Business Regulation - Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - RevisionsDelegate SophocleusApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1339Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of PaymentDelegate MinnickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1523Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and ExpungementDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0169Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and ConfidentialitySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0185
    (HB0332)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0310
    (HB0451)
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - StorageSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0335 / CH0231
    (HB0905)
Health Occupations - Funeral Establishments - Preparation and Holding RoomsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0376Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Safety (E4)
SB0531
    (HB0131)
Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - PenaltiesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0532
    (HB0655)
Criminal Law - Child's Access to Firearms - PenaltySenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0562
    (HB0457)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental AreaHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0725
    (HB0279)
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap MetalSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0780Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage AgentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0815 / CH0559
    (HB1014 / CH0560)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Epinephrine Availability and Use - PolicySenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0867
    (HB0997)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0875Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.