Storage

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108
    (SB0037)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0415Cedar Hope Chests - Prohibition on Manufacture, Import, and Sale (McKenna's Law)Delegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0458Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic FracturingDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0523Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event LicenseDelegate BeitzelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0656Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0658
    (SB0344 / CH0342)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB0689 / CH0449
    (SB0523)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery LicenseDelegate CarozzaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0945
    (SB0626 / CH0044)
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and DevicesDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0035Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - FeesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0037
    (HB0108)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0229Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil PenaltiesCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0344 / CH0342
    (HB0658)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0523
    (HB0689 / CH0449)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery LicenseSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0613
    (HB0786 / CH0103)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0626 / CH0044
    (HB0945)
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and DevicesSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0715 / CH0194Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event LicenseSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0812Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery LicenseSenator ReillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0911Comptroller - Special Event Liquor PermitSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.