Storage

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0269 / CH0637
    (SB0531 / CH0638)
Housing Navigator and Aftercare ProgramDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0296Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0316
    (SB0428)
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - RequirementsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0490
    (SB0758 / CH0389)
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage SystemsDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0582Pharmacies - Availability of Generically Equivalent DrugsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0693
    (SB0642)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - RevisionsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0771 / CH0216
    (SB0262 / CH0215)
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health DepartmentsDelegate Miller, W.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0773 / CH0382
    (SB0715)
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology StudyDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0824 / CH0823
    (SB0548 / CH0824)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0876
    (SB0918)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1395Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy StorageDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0262 / CH0215
    (HB0771 / CH0216)
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health DepartmentsSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0428
    (HB0316)
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0642
    (HB0693)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - RevisionsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0758 / CH0389
    (HB0490)
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage SystemsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0918
    (HB0876)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0965Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.