Subpoenas

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0070Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Elections (G1)
HB0150
    (SB0694 / CH0328)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0219 / CH0089
    (SB0216)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0390
    (SB0057 / CH0121)
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsDorchester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0402 / CH0399
    (SB0314 / CH0153)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0418
    (SB0691)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0454 / CH0230Gaming - Emergency Suspension of LicenseChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0483State Government - Inspector GeneralDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0857Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit CourtsDelegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0908 / CH0560
    (SB0849 / CH0559)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0912 / CH0242
    (SB0924)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacyDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0941
    (SB0536)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - EstablishmentDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1066Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding ArbitrationDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1119
    (SB0877)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1211State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and RegulationDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1221Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet CommunicationsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1224
    (SB0989)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding ArbitrationDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1269Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1352 / CH0654
    (SB0964)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1361Joint Committee to Review the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Audit by the Office of Legislative AuditsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0057 / CH0121
    (HB0390)
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0216
    (HB0219 / CH0089)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0234Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and ConfidentialitySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0314 / CH0153
    (HB0402 / CH0399)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0536
    (HB0941)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0691
    (HB0418)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0694 / CH0328
    (HB0150)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0849 / CH0559
    (HB0908 / CH0560)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0877
    (HB1119)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0924
    (HB0912 / CH0242)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0964
    (HB1352 / CH0654)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0989
    (HB1224)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding ArbitrationSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Personnel (P4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.