Subpoenas

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0188 / CH0478Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of InformationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0497 / CH0360
    (SB0200 / CH0359)
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and RevisionsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0508
    (SB0330)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0485 / CH0677)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceDelegate KellyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0992Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - RepealDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1086Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of the Inspector General - Establishment PG 421-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1132Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Board of Ethics - Subpoena Power PG/MC 105-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1220 / CH0136Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery ActivitiesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1248
    (SB0428)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1262
    (SB0829)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1361
    (SB0776)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0200 / CH0359
    (HB0497 / CH0360)
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0330
    (HB0508)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0428
    (HB1248)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0446Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0485 / CH0677
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0776
    (HB1361)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0829
    (HB1262)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0839
    (HB0958 / CH0499)
Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade SecretsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1142State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship ProgramSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.