Subpoenas

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0355
    (SB0302)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0419 / CH0130Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0981 / CH0834
    (SB0875 / CH0833)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1439
    (SB0870)
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena PowerSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1626Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal InformationDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0122Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018Senator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0302
    (HB0355)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0870
    (HB1439)
Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena PowerPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0875 / CH0833
    (HB0981 / CH0834)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.