Summonses

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0309Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money JudgmentDelegate NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0336
    (SB0009)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0968Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to RepossessDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1220 / CH0409Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear DesignationDelegate SwainApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1251Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales ProhibitionDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1481
    (SB0557 / CH0287)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0009
    (HB0336)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0307Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013Senator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0557 / CH0287
    (HB1481)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0891Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's EstateSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1069Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.