Surveyors

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0306 / CH0319Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their SpousesDelegate SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 319Economic Matters
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0871 / CH0636
    (SB0234)
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - VoidDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1428
    (SB0748)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - ApplicationDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1457 / CH0139Land Surveyors - Qualifications for License - Education, Experience, and Examination RequirementsDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0234
    (HB0871 / CH0636)
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - VoidSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0245 / CH0318Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their SpousesSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 318Finance
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0748
    (HB1428)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - ApplicationSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.