Talbot County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042
    (SB0020)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Easton Head Start CenterDelegate CaneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0290
    (SB0147)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0847
    (SB0882)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oxford Community CenterDelegate CaneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0020
    (HB0042)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Easton Head Start CenterSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0147
    (HB0290)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0882
    (HB0847)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oxford Community CenterSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.