Talbot County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0206
    (SB0140)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime MuseumDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0208
    (SB0139)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training CenterDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0226 / CH0150
    (SB0016 / CH0149)
Talbot County - Board of Education - Student MembersDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0526
    (SB0747)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1097
    (SB0729)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramEastern Shore DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1169
    (SB0963)
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - CompensationDelegate MautzIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1350
    (SB0707 / CH0420)
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and DefinitionDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1596
    (SB1113)
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - FirearmsDelegate MautzIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0016 / CH0149
    (HB0226 / CH0150)
Talbot County - Board of Education - Student MembersSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0139
    (HB0208)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training CenterSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0140
    (HB0206)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime MuseumSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0707 / CH0420
    (HB1350)
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and DefinitionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0728
    (HB1143)
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler SystemsSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0729
    (HB1097)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator HersheyIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0747
    (HB0526)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0963
    (HB1169)
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - CompensationSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1113
    (HB1596)
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - FirearmsSenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.