Tax Returns

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0194 / CH0049State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - ExemptionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1536
    (SB0546)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1782 / CH0037Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Delegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0107Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting RequirementsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0387 / CH0038Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Senator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0546
    (HB1536)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 25, 2018 10:06 A.M.