Tax Sales

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0385 / CH0484Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground RentDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0566
    (SB0142)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0762Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0970 / CH0566
    (SB0591 / CH0565)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1153Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0142
    (HB0566)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0456Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0591 / CH0565
    (HB0970 / CH0566)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.