Textbooks

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0487Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0875
    (SB0665)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0405Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0665
    (HB0875)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.