Theft

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0156
    (SB0191)
Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - RepealDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0531Criminal Law - Mail Theft - PenaltyDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0727Criminal Defendants - Citations - TheftDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0742 / CH0386
    (SB0991)
Criminal Procedure - Citation AuthorityDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0942 / CH0301
    (SB0624 / CH0300)
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care RecordsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1077Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or StolenDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1092Public Safety - Firearms - Reporting Loss or TheftDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1125
    (SB0388)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1396 / CH0415Criminal Law - Theft-Related Crimes - PenaltiesDelegate ConawayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1492
    (SB0387)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0191
    (HB0156)
Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - PenaltySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0387
    (HB1492)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0388
    (HB1125)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0540Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or StolenSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0624 / CH0300
    (HB0942 / CH0301)
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care RecordsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 300Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0791
    (HB0916 / CH0651)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceSenator KelleyIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0816Courts - Civil Action for Embezzlement by EmployeeSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0991
    (HB0742 / CH0386)
Criminal Procedure - Citation AuthoritySenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.