Threats

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0480Criminal Law - Harassment - Misuse of Interactive Computer ServiceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0828Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1321Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1326Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1415 / CH0841
    (SB0858 / CH0842)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect PurchasersDelegate AndersonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Economic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HJ0003
    (SJ0005 / JR0001)
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017Delegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationRules and Executive Nominations
2/10/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
Budget and TaxationState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0858 / CH0842
    (HB1415 / CH0841)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect PurchasersSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0993Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer and Correctional OfficerSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SJ0005 / JR0001
    (HJ0003)
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017Senator KasemeyerSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.