Threats

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and DrillsDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0246
    (SB0671)
Hate Crimes - Threats and PenaltiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0838
    (SB0584)
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0874 / CH0281
    (SB0892)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1276
    (SB0881)
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution OffensesDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1611Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1695Crimes – Hate Crimes – DefacementDelegate ChangIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1698Education - Life Changing Experiences School Program - EstablishedDelegate ChangIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1720Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and PoliciesDelegate PattersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1807
    (SB1250)
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School PropertyDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1811Education - Threat Assessment Teams - Establishment and OversightDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1816
    (SB1257)
Safe Schools Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0122Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018Senator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0584
    (HB0838)
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0671
    (HB0246)
Hate Crimes - Threats and PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0725 / CH0366Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School ResponseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0769 / CH0365Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge PornSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0881
    (HB1276)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution OffensesSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0892
    (HB0874 / CH0281)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0904Public Schools – Social Media Use by EducatorsSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1250
    (HB1807)
Criminal Law – Threat of Mass ViolenceSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1257
    (HB1816)
Safe Schools Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 9:24 A.M.