Time

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0159Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services ProvidersDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0389
    (SB0455)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayDelegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0407
    (SB0123)
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School ScheduleDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0452 / CH0421
    (SB0497)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsDelegate EbersoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0623
    (SB0418 / CH0030)
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - ExtensionDelegate MieleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0969
    (SB0688)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1018Election Law - Early Voting Centers and Polling Places - Waiting Times to VoteDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1081Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - EstablishmentDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Delegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0123
    (HB0407)
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School ScheduleSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0275Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for CommutersSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0418 / CH0030
    (HB0623)
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - ExtensionSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0455
    (HB0389)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DaySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0497
    (HB0452 / CH0421)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0688
    (HB0969)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0877
    (HB1195)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Senator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.