Toilets

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0141
    (SB0782)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0507 / CH0096
    (SB0263 / CH0095)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility LicenseFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0263 / CH0095
    (HB0507 / CH0096)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility LicenseSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0496 / CH0705Environment – Graywater – Residential UseSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 705Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0782
    (HB0141)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:11 P.M.