Towing

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0238 / CH0777Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 777Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0531 / CH0544
    (SB0445 / CH0545)
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual SignalsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0598Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0903 / CH0780
    (SB0847)
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled VehicleDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 780Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1543Tow Trucks – Driver Safety ActDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1770
    (SB0521)
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned VehiclesDelegate GrammerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0445 / CH0545
    (HB0531 / CH0544)
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual SignalsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 545Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0521
    (HB1770)
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned VehiclesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0847
    (HB0903 / CH0780)
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled VehicleWashington County SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.