Traffic Regulation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video RecordingsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0186Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Fees for Traffic and Criminal Convictions - Law Enforcement Training and Technology FundDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0190District Court Electronic Citation Fund and FeeDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0223Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0251
    (SB0785)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0421Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0429
    (SB0319)
Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain VehiclesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0435Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0445Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Overtaking Another VehicleDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0559 / CH0048
    (SB0408 / CH0047)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0586Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Appeal on the Record - Nonincarcerable Traffic ViolationDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0593
    (SB0298)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Allegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0619
    (SB0206)
Vehicle Laws - Intercounty Connector - Maximum Speed LimitDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0680 / CH0632
    (SB0566)
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on HighwaysDelegate HoganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0836 / CH0065
    (SB0600 / CH0064)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0889
    (SB0621 / CH0066)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0929Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1094Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1346Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1415Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and EquipmentDelegate MyersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1465Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0206
    (HB0619)
Vehicle Laws - Intercounty Connector - Maximum Speed LimitSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0207Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0298
    (HB0593)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Senator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0319
    (HB0429)
Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain VehiclesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0378Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow TruckSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0389Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0408 / CH0047
    (HB0559 / CH0048)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0566
    (HB0680 / CH0632)
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on HighwaysSenator BrinkleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0600 / CH0064
    (HB0836 / CH0065)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0621 / CH0066
    (HB0889)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0785
    (HB0251)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB1048Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil PenaltiesSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.