Traffic Regulation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0133
    (SB0169)
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement OfficerDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0194
    (SB0044 / CH0320)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysDelegate BeitzelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0271Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Quarterly AuditsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0292Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York RoadBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0339
    (SB0413 / CH0127)
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting RequirementsDelegate CarterVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0410Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Application to Right TurnsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0450
    (SB0371 / CH0028)
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority AreasDelegate CarrVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0471School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltyDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0506
    (SB0410 / CH0168)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetyDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0539State Highway Administration - Evaluation of Urban Highways - Classifications and Speed LimitsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0588
    (SB0547)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0609Prince George's County - Motorcycle Operators - Penalties for Speed Violations PG 311-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0680Evidence - Conviction for Traffic Offense - Admissibility in Civil ProceedingDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0808
    (SB0098)
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Service VehicleDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0814Vehicle Laws - Intercounty Connector - Maximum Speed LimitDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0818Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane ChangesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0917 / CH0287
    (SB0716)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0918
    (SB0727)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1025School Vehicles - Right Turn on Red - ProhibitionDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1038Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1086
    (SB0132)
Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Designees - Hearing and ApprovalDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1219Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0044 / CH0320
    (HB0194)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0098
    (HB0808)
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Service VehicleSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0132
    (HB1086)
Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Designees - ApprovalSenator BrochinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0169
    (HB0133)
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement OfficerSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0316Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementSenator RamirezIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0371 / CH0028
    (HB0450)
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority AreasSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0410 / CH0168
    (HB0506)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetySenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0413 / CH0127
    (HB0339)
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting RequirementsSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0547
    (HB0588)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0716
    (HB0917 / CH0287)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0727
    (HB0918)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingSenator NormanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.