Traffic Regulation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0024Natural Resources - Forest, Park, and Wildlife Rangers - Parking CitationsDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0082 / CH0681
    (SB0125 / CH0682)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0237
    (SB0779)
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited ActsDelegate CarrIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0290 / CH0719
    (SB0536)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemDelegate GrammerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 719Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0332Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 23-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0333Motor Vehicles - Aggressive DrivingDelegate Howard, C.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0337Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limit in Business and Residential Districts MC 22-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0411
    (SB0418)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0578
    (SB0338)
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid BeaconsDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0844
    (SB0799 / CH0488)
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of PointsDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0862Baltimore County - Elementary Schools - Speed BumpsDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0930
    (SB0640)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0947Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local JurisdictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0997 / CH0754
    (SB0925)
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in CrosswalksDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 754Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1079Roadways - Crossing by Pedestrians of Roadways - Authority of Local JurisdictionsDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1199
    (SB0865)
Vehicle Laws - School Zone Crosswalks - Traffic Control SignalsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1301 / CH0760
    (SB0078)
Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct TrafficDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 760Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1334 / CH0761State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative TreatmentsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1335 / CH0756
    (SB0012)
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementDelegate WilkinsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 756Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1409Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to AppearDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1654Vehicle Laws - Work Zone Speed Control System - Increased Penalty for Multiple OffensesDelegate ChangIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0012
    (HB1335 / CH0756)
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementSenator RamirezVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0078
    (HB1301 / CH0760)
Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct TrafficSenator RosapepeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0125 / CH0682
    (HB0082 / CH0681)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0338
    (HB0578)
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid SignalsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0418
    (HB0411)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0536
    (HB0290 / CH0719)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemSenator SallingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0640
    (HB0930)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0779
    (HB0237)
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited ActsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0799 / CH0488
    (HB0844)
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of PointsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0865
    (HB1199)
Vehicle Laws - School Zone Crosswalks - Traffic Control SignalsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0925
    (HB0997 / CH0754)
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in CrosswalksSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.