Transportation, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0394Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Environment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0104Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0119
    (SB0708)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Delegate MorhaimIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0172
    (SB0778)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0300 / CH0238Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization StudyDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Delegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0514 / CH0429
    (SB0258)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0702
    (SB0657)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0258
    (HB0514 / CH0429)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0370 / CH0164Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0379Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0381State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0657
    (HB0702)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0708
    (HB0119)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Senator ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0778
    (HB0172)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0802 / CH0052
    (HB0466 / CH0053)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Senator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.