Transportation, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0126)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0035Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0229 / CH0256Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation EmergenciesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0236Minority Business Enterprises - Transitioning From Subcontractors to Prime Contractors - Study and ReportDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0391
    (SB0020)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0403 / CH0581
    (SB0826 / CH0580)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Delegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 581Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0647
    (SB0543)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0685Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging PopulationDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB1011Department of Transportation - Modal Administrations - AppointmentsDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1023
    (SB0966)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of FrederickDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1068 / CH0644
    (SB0788)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Pub Crawl Promoter's PermitsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1338Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 CorridorDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1425
    (SB1003)
Department of Information Technology - Data Sharing and IntegrationDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1434Rail Safety Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1439Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1574
    (SB1070)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0020
    (HB0391)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0056Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and PaymentSenator MathiasIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0126
    (HB0008)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0318Department of Transportation - Heads of Modal Administrations - Senate ConfirmationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0500Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0543
    (HB0647)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0788
    (HB1068 / CH0644)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Pub Crawl Promoter's PermitsSenator FergusonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0826 / CH0580
    (HB0403 / CH0581)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Senator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0966
    (HB1023)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of FrederickSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1003
    (HB1425)
Department of Information Technology - Data Sharing and IntegrationSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1070
    (HB1574)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.