Transportation, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0082 / CH0681
    (SB0125 / CH0682)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0149 / CH0112Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight AuthorityChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0390 / CH0586
    (SB0310 / CH0587)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructureSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0402
    (SB0307 / CH0030)
Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0614
    (SB0483)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0664 / CH0033
    (SB0579 / CH0675)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0907
    (SB0850)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1021 / CH0590Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1050
    (SB1065)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1132
    (SB1149 / CH0785)
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1290State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air QualityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0125 / CH0682
    (HB0082 / CH0681)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0307 / CH0030
    (HB0402)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0310 / CH0587
    (HB0390 / CH0586)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructurePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0314 / CH0367
    (HB0417 / CH0366)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0393 / CH0363Clean Cars Act of 2017Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0483
    (HB0614)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0661State Personnel - Contractual Employees - Transfer to Budgeted or Permanent PositionsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0850
    (HB0907)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1065
    (HB1050)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1149 / CH0785
    (HB1132)
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School StudentsSenator OaksEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.