Treasurers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0410 / CH0230
    (SB0321 / CH0229)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0470Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax CollectionDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0520St. Mary's County - Public Officials - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0720 / CH0558
    (SB0814 / CH0557)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1390 / CH0681Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - EstablishmentChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1452Linked Deposit Program for Small BusinessesDelegate VaughnIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0154 / CH0194Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax CollectionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0321 / CH0229
    (HB0410 / CH0230)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0814 / CH0557
    (HB0720 / CH0558)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1072 / CH0345Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business EnterprisesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2013 - 10:30 a.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.