Treasurers

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0589 / CH0097Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Certification for License ApplicationCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0775 / CH0275Inaugural Committees - Donations and Disbursements - DisclosureDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0890State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0147Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice RequirementsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0165State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of BenefitsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0374 / CH0165
    (HB0405)
Maryland False Claims ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0683State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - EstablishedSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.