Treasurers

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0107 / CH0107St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Disposition of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses FeesSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0332Election Law - Use of Campaign Material Purchased Under the Authority of a Prior TreasurerDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0432 / CH0148
    (SB0545)
Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)Delegate LiermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 148Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0447 / CH0771
    (SB1156)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 771Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0526Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0543Law Enforcement - First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty FundDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0768Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - DisclosureDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0841
    (SB1049)
Higher Education - Endowed University System of Maryland Scholarship Program - EstablishedDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1091
    (SB1030)
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1224
    (SB1218 / CH0748)
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1350 / CH0628
    (SB1006 / CH0629)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1357 / CH0841Calvert County - County Officials - SalariesCalvert County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1548 / CH0639
    (SB1084 / CH0640)
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership FundDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1606Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Vocational Certificate Grant Program - EstablishedDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1643Income Tax - Credit for Contributions to the Maryland Excellence in Education FundDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1653Solar Electric Generating Facility Decommissioning and Restoration - Security - FundDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1685 / CH0558
    (SB0912 / CH0559)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Delegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1731Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1732Public Safety - Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1787State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide PreventionDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0545
    (HB0432 / CH0148)
Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - EstablishmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0606 / CH0700Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail FundSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 700Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0912 / CH0559
    (HB1685 / CH0558)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Senator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1006 / CH0629
    (HB1350 / CH0628)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1030
    (HB1091)
Off–Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund – EstablishmentSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1049
    (HB0841)
Higher Education - Endowed University System of Maryland Scholarship Program - EstablishedSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB1084 / CH0640
    (HB1548 / CH0639)
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1156
    (HB0447 / CH0771)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentSenator SmithIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1218 / CH0748
    (HB1224)
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018Senator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 748Finance
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB1236Public-Private Partnerships - Transportation Facility Projects - Environmental Impact StatementChair, PST&E Subcommittee of the Budget & Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.