Trees

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0238Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air NavigationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0376Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, or RegulationDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0513Natural Resources - Forest Harvesting - Public Notice of Process and LicenseesDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0611
    (SB0747)
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation ManagementDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0636
    (SB0154)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0832Natural Resources - Licensed Tree Experts - Insurance and FeesDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1145
    (SB0903)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentDelegate FrushIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0154
    (HB0636)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0747
    (HB0611)
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation ManagementSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0903
    (HB1145)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.