Trials

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0152Criminal Procedure - Successive Federal and State Prosecutions - BarDelegate AndersonIn the House - Third Reading Failed (46-89)Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0180 / CH0062
    (SB0580 / CH0061)
Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative DefenseDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0336
    (SB0009)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0382Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court CostsDelegate NiemannIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0652
    (SB0817)
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of MinorsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0821Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0909 / CH0650
    (SB0872)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 650Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0968Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to RepossessDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1037
    (SB0630)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1112
    (SB0556)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1251Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales ProhibitionDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0009
    (HB0336)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0043Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair EstimatesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0556
    (HB1112)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0580 / CH0061
    (HB0180 / CH0062)
Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative DefenseSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0626Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court CostsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0630
    (HB1037)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0817
    (HB0652)
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of MinorsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0872
    (HB0909 / CH0650)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterSenator JacobsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.