Trials

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0369
    (SB0316)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (The Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2017)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0377
    (SB0940)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Gaming (C7)
HB0428
    (SB0574)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1393
    (SB0675)
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial ConvictionsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1409Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to AppearDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1411
    (SB0677)
DNA Testing - Postconviction ReviewDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0316
    (HB0369)
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (The Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2017)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0501Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by JurySenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0574
    (HB0428)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Senator FeldmanIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0675
    (HB1393)
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial ConvictionsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0677
    (HB1411)
DNA Testing - Postconviction ReviewSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0836Civil Actions - Punitive Damage AwardsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0940
    (HB0377)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Gaming (C7)
SB0946Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

April 10, 2017 11:43 P.M.