Truancy

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0207 / CH0355Education - Truant StudentsDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0657Truancy Education Program - Parents and Guardians of StudentsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1333Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1005Baltimore County - Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.