Truancy

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0319 / CH0706
    (SB0160 / CH0707)
Juvenile Law – TruancyDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 706Judiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1464Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1507Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of NeglectDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0160 / CH0707
    (HB0319 / CH0706)
Juvenile Law – TruancySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 707Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:33 A.M.