Trucks

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0886Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning DevicesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0064 / CH0015Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of CertificatesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 15Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0072 / CH0176Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and PenaltiesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0073 / CH0018Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening StandardsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0378Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow TruckSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.