Tuition

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0471Public Institutions of Higher Education - Tuition Rates - VeteransDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsHigher Education (F2)
HB0526 / CH0374Higher Education - Maryland First Scholarship - Creation and FundingDelegate SummersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
HB0739Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - ReportingDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Higher Education (F2)
HB0740
    (SB0705)
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed ForcesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0754Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified OfferDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0831 / CH0564
    (SB0828 / CH0563)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0833
    (SB0740 / CH0533)
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013Delegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0862Higher Education - In-State Tuition - Reduction for EducatorsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0871Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County TuitionDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0928Community Colleges - Dually Enrolled Students - Tuition WaiverDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0935 / CH0654Public Institutions of Higher Education - In-State Tuition for Military VeteransDelegate StiflerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0963 / CH0395Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship ProgramsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1012 / CH0260
    (SB0414 / CH0259)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1013
    (SB0543)
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other ChargesDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1033Education - Taxpayers' Savings ActDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1288Accountability in Education Act of 2013Delegate StocksdaleIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0414 / CH0259
    (HB1012 / CH0260)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0543
    (HB1013)
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other ChargesSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0705
    (HB0740)
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed ForcesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB0740 / CH0533
    (HB0833)
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0812Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0828 / CH0563
    (HB0831 / CH0564)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsHigher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.