Tuition

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2016Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0064Income Tax Credit - Payment of Tuition at a Community CollegeDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0231
    (SB0313)
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Financial Aid - Reduction ProhibitedDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0400 / CH0263Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - ModificationsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0453Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0464
    (SB0376 / CH0144)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0709 / CH0672
    (SB0422 / CH0671)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0741 / CH0553
    (SB0427 / CH0552)
Higher Education - Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Consumer Protection ProvisionsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1014 / CH0690
    (SB0676 / CH0689)
College Affordability Act of 2016Delegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1087 / CH0647Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in Prince George's County PG 438-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1288 / CH0306Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless YouthDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1295
    (SB0639)
Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in MarylandDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1541Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition WaiverAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
HB1607
    (SB1052 / CH0025)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
HB1620
    (SB0698)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates and Associate's Degrees - Tuition WaiverDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0102Governor's Office for Children and Services to ChildrenChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) AdoptedFinance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0313
    (HB0231)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction RestrictionsSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0376 / CH0144
    (HB0464)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 144Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0465Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - RequirementsSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0595 / CH0686Education - Middle School Students - Awarding of CreditSenator RosapepeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0639
    (HB1295)
Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in MarylandSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0676 / CH0689
    (HB1014 / CH0690)
College Affordability Act of 2016Senator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0698
    (HB1620)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates and Associate's Degrees - Tuition WaiverSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1052 / CH0025
    (HB1607)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Senator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.